Kennametal board of directors
Web2 mrt. 2011 · Kennametal Inc. (NYSE: KMT) announced today the appointment of William J. Harvey to its Board of Directors effective March 2, 2011 . Mr. Harvey is President -- DuPont Packaging and Industrial Polymers, a multi-billion dollar global business unit of E.I. DuPont de Nemours & Company. Web17 nov. 2014 · Aside from DeFeo, Kennametal's board also includes six independent directors; Stranghoener; Cindy L. Davis; Philip A. Dur; William J. Harvey; Timothy R. McLevish; and Steven H. Wunning, who collectively bring diverse experience from a range of companies, including Caterpillar, DuPont, Kraft Foods, Mosaic, Nike, Northrop …
Kennametal board of directors
Did you know?
WebKennametal Inc 2005 - 2007 2 years. Kennametal 7 years Division Quality Manager Kennametal ... DeltaARTS Board of Directors Secretary ... Web17 nov. 2014 · Aside from DeFeo, Kennametal's board also includes six independent directors; Stranghoener; Cindy L. Davis; Philip A. Dur; William J. Harvey; Timothy R. …
Web24 mei 2024 · PITTSBURGH, May 24, 2024 /PRNewswire/ -- Kennametal Inc. (NYSE: KMT) announced today the election of Lorraine M. Martin to its board of directors, … Web“We are pleased to welcome Ron to the Enpro Board,” said David Hauser, ... He has held various leadership roles of increasing responsibility at Kennametal Inc. and Ingersoll Rand Inc. He also served on the Board of Directors at US Ecology for five years until Republic Services acquired it in 2024.
Web15 dec. 2024 · PITTSBURGH, Dec. 15, 2024 /PRNewswire/ -- Kennametal Inc. (NYSE: KMT) announced today the election of Paul Sternlieb to its board of directors, effective … Web24 feb. 2014 · Rahul began his career in Sales & Application engineering with Kennametal Inc and has worked across India, USA, Nigeria, South …
Web15 dec. 2024 · PITTSBURGH, Dec. 15, 2024 /PRNewswire/ -- Kennametal Inc. (NYSE: KMT) announced today the election of Paul Sternlieb to its board of directors, effective …
Web24 mei 2024 · PITTSBURGH, May 24, 2024 /PRNewswire/ -- Kennametal Inc. (NYSE: KMT) announced today the election of Lorraine M. Martin to its board of directors, effective July 1, 2024. Ms. Martin recently retired as the executive vice president and deputy of Lockheed Martin Corporation's Rotary and Mission Systems. tsuyoshi tane architectsWebFor and on behalf of the Board of Directors of Kennametal India Limited. B.Anjani Kumar Director . Bhagya Chandra Rao Managing Director . Bengaluru August 21,2015. Advertisement. tsuyoshi nagabuchi online live 2020WebKennametal Inc. announced today that it is expanding its board of directors to 10 members, and that it has elected Lawrence W. Stranghoener, executive vice president and … phnr number of medinne bow wovingWebKennametal Apr 2001 - Jul 2006 5 years 4 months. Detroit Metropolitan Area Co Founder - VP Marketing and Product Development Industrial ... tsuyoshi totani google scholarWeb15 dec. 2024 · PITTSBURGH , Dec. 15, 2024 /PRNewswire/ -- Kennametal Inc. (NYSE: KMT) announced today the election of Paul Sternlieb to its board of directors, effective … tsuyoshi todoWeb1 aug. 2024 · PITTSBURGH, June 29, 2024 /PRNewswire/ -- Kennametal Inc. (NYSE: KMT) announced today that its board of directors has appointed Christopher (Chris) Rossi as president and chief executive officer and has named him a director. Chris succeeds Ron De Feo whom the board has appointed executive chairman of the board. Both … phn safeconWeb1 mei 2002 · Tambakeras, 51, said. "I appreciate the board's vote of confidence and look forward to working with our 12,000 employees worldwide to help the company achieve even greater success in the future." William R. Newlin, chairman of the board since 1996 and a director since 1982, said Tambakeras had earned the right to lead Kennametal's board. phn rockhampton office